Wednesday, October 12, 2011

TIPS N TRICKS

SOME OF MY TRICKS WHICH I FORGOT LAST TIME.....

Multiply Up to 20X20 In Your Head

In just FIVE minutes you should learn to quickly multiply up to 20x20 in your head.  With this trick, you will be able to multiply any two numbers from 11 to 19 in your head quickly, without the use of a calculator.
I will assume that you know your multiplication table reasonably well up to 10x10.
Try this:

  • Take 15 x 13 for an example.
  • Always place the larger number of the two on top in your mind.
  • Then draw the shape of Africa mentally so it covers the 15 and the 3 from the 13 below. Those covered numbers are all you need.
  • First add 15 + 3 = 18
  • Add a zero behind it (multiply by 10) to get 180.
  • Multiply the covered lower 3 x the single digit above it the "5" (3x5= 15)
  • Add 180 + 15 = 195. 


Multiply Up to 20X20 In Your Head

In just FIVE minutes you should learn to quickly multiply up to 20x20 in your head.  With this trick, you will be able to multiply any two numbers from 11 to 19 in your head quickly, without the use of a calculator. I will assume that you know your multiplication table reasonably well up to 10x10.
Try this:

  • Take 15 x 13 for an example.
  • Always place the larger number of the two on top in your mind.
  • Then draw the shape of Africa mentally so it covers the 15 and the 3 from the 13 below. Those covered numbers are all you need.
  • First add 15 + 3 = 18
  • Add a zero behind it (multiply by 10) to get 180.
  • Multiply the covered lower 3 x the single digit above it the "5" (3x5= 15)
  • Add 180 + 15 = 195.

The 11 Rule

You likely all know the 10 rule (to multiply by 10, just add a 0 behind the number) but do you know the 11 rule? It is as easy! You should be able to do this one in you head for any two digit number. Practice it on paper first! To multiply any two digit number by 11:
  • For this example we will use 54.
  • Separate the two digits in you mind (5__4).
  • Notice the hole between them!
  • Add the 5 and the 4 together (5+4=9)
  • Put the resulting 9 in the hole 594. That's it! 11 x 54=594
The only thing tricky to remember is that if the result of the addition is greater than 9, you only put the "ones" digit in the hole and carry the "tens" digit from the addition. For example 11 x 57 ... 5__7 ... 5+7=12 ... put the 2 in the hole and add the 1 from the 12 to the 5 in to get 6 for a result of 627 ... 11 x 57 = 627
Practice it on paper first!

Square 2 Digit Number: UP-DOWN Method

Square a 2 Digit Number, for this example 37:
  • Look for the nearest 10 boundary
  • In this case up 3 from 37 to 40.
  • Since you went UP 3 to 40 go DOWN 3 from 37 to 34.
  • Now mentally multiply 34x40
  • The way I do it is 34x10=340;
  • Double it mentally to 680
  • Double it again mentally to 1360
  • This 1360 is the FIRST interim answer.
  • 37 is "3" away from the 10 boundary 40.
  • Square this "3" distance from 10 boundary.
  • 3x3=9 which is the SECOND interim answer.
  • Add the two interim answers to get the final answer.
  • Answer: 1360 + 9 = 1369 

1 comment:

  1. You make a thoughtful case about how technology can enhance the good works of early childhood educators. I look forward to hearing more about how EC educators are connecting and sharing through technology. Thanks!
    tachnologys basket

    ReplyDelete